SEDBERGH UNITED CHARITIES AND WIDOWS' HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 231058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

One Fund provides grants for educational purposes to people under 25 years old and a second provides grants to people in financial hardship. These are restricted to inhabitants of the civil parish of Sedbergh. A third owns a building rented by Cumbria CC as a library,the income can be used to give grants for charitable purposes in Sedbergh and its neighbourhood. A fourth fund owns an almshouse.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £22,396
Total expenditure: £22,121

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 1964: Standard registration
  • 05 January 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLONEL ANTHONY JAMES REED SCREEN OBE Chair
SEDBERGH PEPPERPOT CLUB
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of Sedbergh and Lune
Received: 143 days late
SEDBERGH AND DISTRICT CIO
Received: On time
Hazel Margaret Hodgson Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Rev Andrew Graham Burgess Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Kerry Suzanne Stevens Trustee 07 April 2020
None on record
Rachel Anne Cowperthwaite Trustee 07 April 2020
None on record
JANE MARGARET ANN HASSAM Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Helen Bromley Trustee 30 May 2018
None on record
John Mansell Sykes Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
LINDA GREENSMITH Trustee 16 January 2018
None on record
MARGARET HELENA BROOKS Trustee 11 November 2016
None on record
Karen Bruce-Lockhart Trustee 20 November 2015
None on record
John Thomas Capstick Trustee 29 July 2014
None on record
KEVIN JOHN LANCASTER Trustee 29 July 2014
None on record
NICHOLAS HUGH BROWN Trustee 18 October 2013
None on record
NORMAN FRANCIS ATKINS Trustee
SEDBERGH AND DISTRICT CIO
Received: On time
Susan Sharrocks Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH SEDBERGH
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of Sedbergh and Lune
Received: 143 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £42.72k £20.95k £20.22k £21.68k £22.40k
Total expenditure £18.51k £8.76k £14.54k £12.28k £22.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 SEPTEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF SEDBERGH AND IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SEDBERGH
Registration history
  • 30 April 1964 : Standard registration
  • 05 January 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
8 Sycamore Avenue
SEDBERGH
Cumbria
LA10 5EZ
Phone:
07786384917
Website:

No information available