THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC FINANCE AND ACCOUNTANCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CIPFA aims to work in the public interest to promote high standards and deliver excellence in governance and financial management throughout the public services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£28,181,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £12.08m | |
Other trading activities | £15.67m | |
Investments | £196.00k | |
Other | £232.00k |
Total expenditure:
£28,111,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £16.25m | |
Other | £11.86m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,427,892 from 374 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.86m | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.25m | |
Retained for future use | £70.00k |
People

259 Employee(s)
36 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 10 |
£80k to £90k | 6 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Botswana
- Canada
- China
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kazakhstan
- Lesotho
- Malta
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Somalia
- Switzerland
- Tajikistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 13 April 1964: Standard registration
- C I P F A (Working name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF MUNICIPAL TREASURERS AND ACCOUNTANTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
36 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriot Winfield | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libby Mason | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Toshihiko Ishihara | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dowse | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Owen | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adesola Adepoju CPFA, FCA | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nina Philippidis | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr D Joyce Christina Dharmaraj | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Skinner | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aneil Jhumat | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Channell | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Nelson | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ileana Steccolini | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Blair | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Milne | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donella Steel | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Dafter | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir Mark Lowcock KCB | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Vaughan | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Crowson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naeem Ahmed | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Williams | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gillett | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Simpson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deirdre Bane | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Smith | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Dean | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Al-Beyerty | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hardev Virdee | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Newbury | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Donaldson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lee Yale-Helms | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lee Outhwaite | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark McBride | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Ann Culley | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Caroline Rassell | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.89m | £26.42m | £26.60m | £28.48m | £28.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.64m | £23.58m | £23.13m | £27.34m | £28.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.74m | £3.25m | £2.74m | £3.43m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £241.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £15.30m | £14.08m | £14.19m | £15.65m | £15.67m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.32m | £12.10m | £12.19m | £12.60m | £12.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.00k | £9.00k | £0 | £0 | £196.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £260.00k | £227.00k | £221.00k | £28.48m | £232.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.57m | £12.42m | £13.56m | £16.61m | £16.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £495.00k | £432.00k | £524.00k | £757.00k | £878.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £17.07m | £11.15m | £9.57m | £10.74m | £11.86m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.22m | £21.24m | £21.67m | £21.06m | £17.98m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.10m | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Other assets | £6.42m | £9.17m | £10.88m | £11.75m | £9.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£27.15m | -£38.57m | -£30.52m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.09m | £7.76m | £5.70m | £17.31m | £14.72m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 24TH OCTOBER 1973 (DATED OCTOBER 2003)
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF PUBLIC FINANCE AND OF ACCOUNTANCY AND COGNATE SUBJECTS AS APPLIED TO ALL OR ANY OF THE DUTIES IMPOSED UPON AND FUNCTIONS UNDERTAKEN BY PUBLIC SERVICE BODIES. B) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION THEREIN. C) TO PROMOTE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF STUDIES AND RESEARCH WORK THEREIN AND IN RELATED SUBJECTS. D) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN ACCOUNTANCY BODIES IN ANY WAY; TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE ANY SCHEME OR SCHEMES (HOWSOEVER CONSTITUTED) WHICH, AS ONE OR MORE OF THEIR OBJECTS, REVIEWS, REGULATES OR SUPPLEMENTS IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST THE ESTABLISHMENT OF STANDARDS BY, AND THE TRAINING, REGULATORY AND DISCIPLINARY ACTIVITIES AND PROCEDURES OF, ANY ONE OR MORE ACCOUNTANCY BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C I P F A
77 MANSELL STREET
LONDON
E1 8AN
- Phone:
- 02075435600
- Email:
- customerservices@cipfa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window