ST MARY'S CONVENT (WORCESTER) HELD IN CONNEXION WITH THE SISTERS OF SAINT MARIE MADELEINE POSTEL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance religious and charitable work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 February 1964: Standard registration
- 02 August 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 August 2012: Funds transferred to 264529 ANGLO-IRISH PROVINCE OF THE SISTERS OF SAINT MARIE...
- ST MARY'S CONVENT (WORCESTER) HELD IN CONNEXION WITH THE SOEURS DE SAINTE MARIE MADELEINE POSTEL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.46k | £169.63k | £92.09k | £58.07k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.36k | £248.65k | £495.35k | £1.09m | £1.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 06 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 01 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 01 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 26 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 26 August 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1951
Charitable objects
FOR ADVANCING SUPPORTING OR MAINTAINING ALL OR ANY OF THE CHARITABLE WORKS FOR THE TIME BEING OR FROM TIME TO TIME CARRIED ON BY THE INSTITUTE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES OR A MAJORITY IN POINT OF NUMBER OF THE TRUSTEES WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window