Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE PRINCESS ROYAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (FARNBOROUGH, KENT)

Charity number: 231071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.17k £40.92k £31.05k £30.26k £13.90k
Total expenditure £63.75k £34.16k £36.93k £15.19k £25.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A