THE MAY LADY TENNYSON MEMORIAL AMBULANCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ambulance service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 18 February 1964: Standard registration
- THE TENNYSON MEMORIAL AMBULANCE (Working name)
- TENNYSON MEMORIAL AMBULANCE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR LES OSMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janet Margaret Haire | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Gillian Pink | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Kennett | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Howe | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
MARGARET IRENE HAWKES | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROSEMARY ELISE ALEXANDRA CHRISTINE T | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KEN MAGEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.23k | £6.80k | £9.87k | £11.13k | £14.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £5.42k | £10.82k | £5.60k | £16.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 27 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
1) SUBJECT TO SUB-CLAUSE (2) THE RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF BRIGHSTONE, FRESHWATER, SHALFLEET, TOTLAND AND YARMOUTH, IN THE COUNTY OF THE ISLE OF WIGHT (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY THE PROVISION OF A VOLUNTARY AMBULANCE SERVICE. 2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS IT IS NOT POSSIBLE TO PROVIDE AN AMBULANCE SERVICE AS AFORESAID, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE WEST WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blue House
Ivylands Close
TOTLAND BAY
Isle Of Wight
PO39 0FG
- Phone:
- 01983 752480
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window