THE TENBY RELIEF IN NEED AND PENSIONS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty for elderly/old people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 08 February 1978: Standard registration
- THE TENBY CHARITIES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Hughes | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Williams | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN STUART POWLING | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRISHA PUTWAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP DAVID SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN ANN CRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KERRI ANN DURHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROLAND GRIGG | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLIVE RICHARD WEBB | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS ELLIE CRAIG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.73k | £39.98k | £28.79k | £32.15k | £40.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.10k | £35.13k | £32.67k | £18.03k | £32.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2024 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2024 | 275 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2024 | 640 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2024 | 640 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2024 | 1005 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2024 | 1005 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 FEBURUARY 1978
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COMMUNITY OF TENBY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CALUSE 25 3F THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF TENBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lewis Lewis & Co Ltd
County Chamber
Pentre Road
St. Clears
CARMARTHEN
SA33 4AA
- Phone:
- 01994231044
- Email:
- clive@lewislewis.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window