Accounts and annual returns THE RAEC AND ETS BRANCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 231250
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 November 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 November 2024 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 January 2024 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 January 2024 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window