THE ENGLISH SANGHA TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main object is the furthering the teaching of the Buddha in the UK. The Charity's main activity is the development, maintenance and upkeep of two Theravada Buddhist monasteries in the UK. These provide focal points for members of the public to learn or deepen their understanding of Buddhism. Typical activities include meditation classes and retreats, public talks and formal ceremonies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,899,630
Donations and legacies | £2.56m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £328.04k | |
Other | £16.17k |
Total expenditure:
£1,158,445
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£3,800 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.16m | |
Retained for future use | £1.74m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.16m | |
Retained for future use | £1.74m |
People

3 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 May 1965: Standard registration
- 28 November 2018: Funds received from 1149071 BUDDHA METTA CAMBRIDGE
- AMARAVATI BUDDHIST MONASTERY (Working name)
- AMARAVATI BUDDHIST MONASTERY/CENTRE (Working name)
- AMARAVATI RETREAT CENTRE (Working name)
- CHITHURST BUDDHIST MONASTERY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PETERS STEVENS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kathleen Lazenbatt | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brigitte Burnett | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CARROLL | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAZUKO KAWAMURA | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LEINSTER | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40m | £11.89m | £1.67m | £1.74m | £3.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £932.74k | £804.33k | £1.04m | £1.06m | £1.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.37m | £11.84m | £1.59m | £1.58m | £2.56m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.63k | £25.05k | £36.63k | £146.20k | £328.04k | |
|
Income - Other | £18.24k | £23.87k | £41.44k | £18.98k | £16.17k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £45.27k | £114.87k | £15.00k | £66.15k | £50.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £932.74k | £804.33k | £1.04m | £1.06m | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.19k | £8.55k | £0 | £0 | £11.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.83m | £10.73m | £12.51m | £14.77m | £19.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £254.52k | |
|
Other assets | £1.66m | £11.93m | £10.70m | £9.52m | £6.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £173.23k | £272.17k | £193.38k | £585.01k | £754.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO FURTHER THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE BUDDHA (BUDDHA SASANA) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY: THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL CENTRES AND OTHER REQUISITES FOR BHIKKUS, NUNS AND SAMANERAS; THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, FOR THE PURPOSES OF INSTRUCTION, FOR OTHER FOLLOWERS OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM; THE PROVISION OF TEACHING AND STUDY OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM; AND AS REQUESTED BY THE THERIS AND THERAS OF THE ENGLISH SANGHA, THE RELIEF OF FOLLOWERS OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amaravati Buddhist Monastery
St. Margarets
Great Gaddesden
Hemel Hempstead
HP1 3BZ
- Phone:
- 01442927019
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window