WESTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY

Charity number: 231314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of two bungalows for let to local residents in need of subsidised housing, the making of grants to applicants in need of assistance, the provision of allotment land to local residents and free loan of wheelchairs for use by the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,305
Total expenditure: £13,657

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WESTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY (Working name)
  • THE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN FRED PENNINGTON Chair
None on record
Richard Pratt Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Julie Craythorn Trustee 17 August 2021
SOUTH HOLLAND PHAB
Received: On time
JULIAN BELLAMY Trustee 26 April 2011
None on record
HENRY HALGARTH Trustee
None on record
COLIN SEATON Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY CASSON Trustee
SOUTH HOLLAND PARISH VOLUNTARY CAR SERVICE
Received: On time
WESTON HILLS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
THE MOULTON HARROX EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN W WALKERS Trustee
THE SPRINGFIELDS HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
RICHARD FRANK ARTHUR FULLER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.95k £6.93k £7.36k £7.08k £7.31k
Total expenditure £9.43k £10.21k £5.93k £10.79k £13.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 27 NOVEMBER 1969 AND 2 AUGUST 1982
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION AND UPKEEP OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE POOR. 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTON
Registration history
  • 29 April 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
48 Casswell Drive
Quadring
SPALDING
Lincolnshire
PE11 4QW
Phone:
07971176124
Website:

No information available