Financial history GREAT CLIFTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 231318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.50k £4.58k £3.36k £3.31k £7.42k
Total expenditure £1.73k £4.63k £4.87k £3.42k £3.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A