RELIGIOUS SISTERS OF CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health care - care of persons suffering from terminal cancer and other life - limiting illnesses. Social and pastoral work. Education. Care for members of the congregation. Worship and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£771,125
Donations and legacies | £337.49k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £428.71k | |
Other | £4.93k |
Total expenditure:
£2,907,712
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.91m | |
Other | £0 |
£312,735 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.91m |
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 December 1963: Standard registration
- RELIGIOUS SISTERS OF CHARITY OF IRELAND (Previous name)
- RELIGIOUS SISTERS OF CHARITY OF IRELAND (KNOWN AS THE IRISH SISTERS OF CHARITY) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER CATHERINE EGAN | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|||||
SISTER MARY CLARKE | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|||||
SISTER ALICE MCGILLY | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
SISTER PATRICIA LENIHAN | Trustee | 28 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £812.11k | £888.97k | £2.83m | £1.18m | £771.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.86m | £1.08m | £3.67m | £1.40m | £2.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £388.07k | £392.28k | £355.65k | £727.64k | £337.49k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £417.14k | £490.19k | £424.19k | £433.24k | £428.71k | |
|
Income - Other | £6.90k | £6.50k | £2.05m | £16.66k | £4.93k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £42.47k | £0 | £0 | £492 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.86m | £1.08m | £3.67m | £1.40m | £2.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £82.17k | £95.88k | £116.86k | £178.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £2.53m | £25.00k | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.49m | £7.37m | £6.66m | £7.14m | £5.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.97m | £15.57m | £16.76m | £14.34m | £13.65m | |
|
Other assets | £379.71k | £465.05k | £598.59k | £379.79k | £374.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £78.75k | £236.61k | £200.50k | £280.95k | £246.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1962 AND SCHEME DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 APR 2024
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME EITHER AS CAPITAL OR INCOME SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF, OR SUPPORTED BY, THE ORDER AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IF AT ANY TIME THE ORDER SHALL CEASE TO EXIST THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE AND IT IS HEREBY DECLARED THAT NO PART OF THE TRUST FUND NEED BE RETAINED OR SHALL BE TREATED AS PERMANENT ENDOWMENT WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011 (AS AMENDED). DEFINITION OF “SUPERIOR “MEANS THE PERSON FOR THE TIME BEING HOLDING THE OFFICE OF CONGREGATIONAL LEADER OF THE ORDER AND INCLUDES ANY PERSON WHO UNDER THE CONSTITUTIONS OF THE ORDER IS FOR THE TIME BEING ENTITLED TO EXERCISE THE FUNCTIONS OF SUCH SUPERIOR.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Josephs Convent
36 Mare Street
Hackney
LONDON
E8 4AD
- Phone:
- 0208 510 3675
- Email:
- bursar@rsoccaritas.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window