Governing document THE FRIENDS OF CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL
Charity Number: 231379

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUN 1859 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 23 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE HAVING FOR ITS OBJECT THEWELFARE OF THE CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL, THE PATIENTS THEREIN, OR THE MEDICAL OR NURSING OR DOMESTIC STAFF OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CROWBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.