Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF JOHN FRAUNCEIS GWYN

Charity number: 231389
Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 January 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required