THE VISCOUNT NORTHCLIFFE PENSION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund was set up under the Will of Viscount Northcliffe for the payment of pensions to previous employees of certain companies who are aged or infirm or incapacitated and are needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Machin | Chair | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.01k | £12.11k | £11.66k | £11.67k | £11.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.92k | £4.41k | £3.80k | £3.39k | £4.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT SCHEME OF 5 DECEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF PENSIONS FOR EX-EMPLOYEES OF THE FOLLOWING COMPANIES WHO ARE: AGED, INCAPACITATED AND ARE NEEDY:- THE TIMES PUBLISHING; THE AMALGAMATED PRESS (1926) ASSOCIATED NEWSPAPERS LTD; CONTINENTAL DAILY MAIL; ANGLE NEWFOUNDLAND DEVELOPMENT CO; NORTH FORELAND GOLD CLUB.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHCLIFFE HOUSE
2 DERRY STREET
LONDON
W8 5TT
- Phone:
- 02036153784
- Email:
- MARK.ABBOTT@DMGT.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window