SIR HENRY PRICE TRUST (PRICEHOLME)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining 22 Almshouses for elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 November 1963: Standard registration
- THE PRICEHOLME TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret Baker | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Anthea Hackett | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|||||
ALEXANDER GEORGE BURKE CUPPAGE | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN KARLE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|||||
TOBIN FEARFIELD DENNIS | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.32k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.03k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED 16/2/1959 AS AMENDED AND VARIED BY ORDER IN CHANCERY DATED THE 5/4/1962.
Charitable objects
HOME, TO BE CALLED "PRINCEHOLME" FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO FROM AGE, ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY ARE WHOLLY OR IN PART UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS. UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HOME AND FOR THE CARE AND MAINTENANCE AND WELFARE AND REASONABLE COMFORT OF THE REDIDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mead Cottage
Lewes Road
Lindfield
Haywards Heath
RH16 2LE
- Phone:
- 01444482068
- Website:
-
thepriceholmetrust.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window