Financial history VICTORIA ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 231451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.61k £16.54k £16.61k £25.47k £16.20k
Total expenditure £10.68k £7.74k £19.20k £32.60k £23.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A