Trustees RICHARD LECHE
Charity number: 231473

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Burchell | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela MacBain | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Alan Knight | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Walker | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Shaw | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Deirdre Birchell | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR BHF TREW | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.