Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - HIGH WYCOMBE BRANCH

Charity number: 231529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £888 £3.53k £1.79k £1.68k £1.84k
Total expenditure £3.40k £14.94k £3.06k £1.74k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A