THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - MELTON MOWBRAY BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raising funds for the welfare of ex service and serving personnel and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barrie James | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Glover | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toby Jonathon Burton | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Fare | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Taylor | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cox | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.34k | £129.98k | £7.02k | £14.34k | £10.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £126.34k | £7.98k | £8.16k | £7.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
MELTON MOWBRAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 ASFORDBY ROAD
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE13 0HR
- Phone:
- 01664 490750
- Email:
- brenda.cox87@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window