THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - CROOK AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare of serving and ex-serving air force people and their dependants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 04 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Heatherington | Chair | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Myers | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Abbott | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Abbott | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Abbott | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.29k | £25.15k | £19.60k | £14.34k | £4.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.72k | £23.98k | £5.65k | £14.34k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
CROOK AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Royal Air Forces Association
12 North Terrace
CROOK
DL15 9AZ
- Phone:
- 07549600203
- Email:
- sharonabbott343@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window