THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - HAVERFORDWEST BRANCH
Charity number: 231610
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide welfare assistance to serving & ex-members of the Royal Air Force and their dependents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income: £581
Total expenditure: £568
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 04 December 1963: Standard registration
- 08 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £525 | £190 | £406 | £581 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.07k | £761 | £1.54k | £1.63k | £568 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HAVERFORDWEST
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window