THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - ST DAVID'S AND SOLVA BRANCH

Charity Number: 231612
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • RAFA ST DAVIDS & SOLVA BRANCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted