Trustees THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - LLANGOLLEN BRANCH

Charity number: 231614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Miles Chair 01 April 2024
None on record
Stuart Hogarth Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Christopher Tobin Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
John Grindley Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Deborah Jane Jones Trustee 25 March 2022
OWAIN GLYNDWR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Jean Robb McKean Grindley Trustee 26 March 2004
THE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY OF JOHN MATTHEWS
Received: On time
Andree Beaverstock Trustee 25 March 2001
None on record