Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - LLANDAFF AND ELY BRANCH

Charity Number: 231629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.56k £3.31k £6.44k £16.51k £8.34k
Total expenditure £23.50k £2.21k £6.55k £17.44k £6.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A