THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - WREXHAM BRANCH
Charity number: 231632
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wings appeal Battle of Britain 70th anniversary appeal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income: £23,660
Total expenditure: £22,531
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Wrexham
Governance
Registration history:
- 26 November 1963: Standard registration
- 08 January 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.42k | £13.72k | £19.86k | £15.54k | £23.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.20k | £11.95k | £21.06k | £16.56k | £22.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 11 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 02 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 03 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WREXHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window