Trustees THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - PLYMOUTH BRANCH
Charity number: 231641

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Group Captain Richard John Colver | Chair | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES PROUT | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Wood | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROGER EDWARD CHARLES GALLOWAY | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN COLVER | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PENNY GILL | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN OLIVER | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.