MORRISTON HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 231687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

annual golf tournament as a fund raiser providing and maintaining on site relatives accommodation weekly transporting patients to on site multi faith centre for sunday worship providing equipment for wards

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,160
Total expenditure: £7,108

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Swansea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN AUBREY HUGHES MBE Chair
None on record
KATHRYN JOHN Trustee 03 March 2020
None on record
DOUGLAS THOMAS Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
HEULWEN JAMES Trustee 08 June 2013
None on record
Jean Fowler Trustee 06 September 2011
The Parish of Casllwchwr and Gorseinon
Received: 117 days late
SIAN HARRIS-WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
PAUL REES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.45k £22.62k £6.94k £18.85k £5.16k
Total expenditure £67.11k £3.53k £12.60k £2.76k £7.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 February 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
60 Pontardulais Road
Tycroes
Ammanford
SA18 3QA
Phone:
01269591874
Email:
No information available