THE THALIDOMIDE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Thalidomide Society works with thalidomide and similarly impaired people, their families and supporters. The Society provides a social network for thalidomide and similarly impaired people and strives to keep the story of thalidomide alive by working with media and medical professionals and students and all other people interested in the history of thalidomide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 May 1963: Standard registration
- THE SOCIETY FOR THE AID OF THALIDOMIDE CHILDREN LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE THALIDOMIDE SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Freeman | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosslyn Hepple | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MANDY DE LA MARE | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Mansell | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gooding | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Tickell | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sukeshi Thakkar | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Freeman | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hogg | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.60k | £74.64k | £22.38k | £90.44k | £33.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.32k | £73.15k | £59.82k | £132.86k | £137.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 04 JUL 2019 as amended on 20 Aug 2020 as amended on 03 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
The objects of the Society are for the public benefit: (1) To assist in the relief of persons with impairments attributable to the effects of the drug known as thalidomide and other persons with similar impairments by: - providing such persons, their families and carers with opportunities to meet each other either in person or via social media at events and meetings organised by the Society; - providing support and information to such persons, their families and carers; (2) To advance the education of the public in the subject of the history of thalidomide by collecting, collating, archiving and preserving documents relating to the history of thalidomide and by undertaking or assisting in the undertaking of educational and research projects concerning the effects of thalidomide and the work of the Society and by publishing the useful results of such educational and research projects.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEWIS SMITH & CO
THE OLD DOCTORS HOUSE
74 GRANGE ROAD
DUDLEY
WEST MIDLANDS
DY1 2AW
- Phone:
- 07802604205
- Email:
- info@thalidomidesociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window