THE ABBEYFIELD RHYL SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 January 1964: Standard registration
- 07 April 2009: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.85k | £61.47k | £57.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.58k | £60.32k | £62.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 15 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 15 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED SEPTEMBER 1962 INCORPORATED 18/7/1962 MODEL DEED ALREADY LODGED
Charitable objects
TO HOUSE LONELY OLD PEOPLE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE ON THEIR OWN, AND IN SO DOING TO PROVIDE A FOCAL POINT FOR THE GOODWILL AND KINDNESS OF NEIGHBOURS.
Area of benefit
RHYL AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window