Financial history NEUADD GOFFA PENRHYNDEUDRAETH

Charity Number: 231804
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.28k £36.73k £20.75k £25.34k £35.30k
Total expenditure £20.20k £17.55k £26.92k £15.43k £31.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A