Accounts and annual returns ASKEWS ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 231809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required