ASKEWS ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides four cottages for the elderly of the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDI MARIE COULTAS | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ALISON ROBINSON | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN McDONNELL | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GOUGH | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANE JANE BUTTERFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.17k | £9.90k | £9.74k | £13.08k | £13.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.77k | £7.44k | £5.67k | £13.81k | £11.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF FREDERICK ASKEW 15 MARCH 1958 AND SCHEME OF 9 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED AND NEEDY PERSONS OF EITHER SEX BEING INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH THORESBY WITH PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE SAID PARISH FOR 10 CONSECUTIVE YEARS AND TO AGRICULTURAL LABOURERS OR OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN AGRICULTURAL PURSUITS AND TO THE WIVES OF SUCH LABOURERS
Area of benefit
NORTH THORESBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 SMITHFIELD
NORTH THORESBY
GRIMSBY
DN36 5RU
- Phone:
- 01472840762
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window