BLAKESLEY AND WOODEND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 231866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village hall/community activities including Pre-school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £15,694
Total expenditure: £15,049

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BLAKESLEY PUBLIC HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth William Vaughan Chair 01 June 2016
None on record
Jenifer Louise Rigby Trustee 20 January 2023
None on record
Ann Muxlow Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
MR WILL STEWART Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN HOPEWELL Trustee
None on record
ANGELA LOCKE Trustee
None on record
Iain Michael Noy Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.00k £4.49k £9.39k £20.27k £15.69k
Total expenditure £10.09k £5.73k £7.65k £14.87k £15.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 December 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Playing Fields
Blakesley
TOWCESTER
NN12 8RN
Phone:
00
Website:

No information available