Financial history THE LONDON CENTRAL MOSQUE (ALGAME) FUND

Charity Number: 231920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.39m £1.07m £1.31m £1.68m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.59m £1.32m £1.47m £1.68m £1.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £137.71k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £898.64k £624.20k £782.83k £1.08m £1.18m
Income - Other trading activities £174.22k £165.06k £214.29k £343.90k £373.65k
Income - Charitable activities £7.28k £4.88k £6.49k £6.77k £5.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £312.99k £176.34k £167.53k £239.75k £264.29k
Income - Other £0 £102.16k £137.71k £4.07k £2.87k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £409.46k £315.73k £392.85k £1.68m £1.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.40k £11.40k £13.80k £17.44k £20.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £39.26k £27.98k £24.90k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.18m £1.00m £1.08m £0 £0