LONDON ARMENIAN POOR RELIEF SOCIETY TRUST

Charity number: 231921
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing relief for the Armenian Poor in London

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,250
Total expenditure: £36,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Krikor Vartoukian Chair
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
BARKEV KASSARDJIAN SIS TRUST
Received: On time
Aram Karakashian-Panossian Trustee 31 July 2023
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
MARAL OVANESSOFF Trustee 08 March 2021
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
Arda Eghiayan Trustee 02 September 2019
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
ARMENIAN INSTITUTE
Received: On time
ARMAND ABRAMIAN Trustee 30 June 2019
THE LONDON ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
NAVASARTIAN CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
HOMENETMEN LONDON
Received: On time
Dr HRATCH KOUYOUMJIAN Trustee 30 June 2019
THE LONDON ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Arline Medazoumian Trustee 12 March 2018
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
ARMINE AFRIKIAN Trustee 26 May 2015
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
STEPHEN MOURADIAN Trustee 23 November 2011
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
GASSIA YARDIM Trustee 23 November 2011
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ARMEN TOPALIAN Trustee
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
ARMENIAN HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.01k £9.00k £9.00k £9.01k £36.25k
Total expenditure £9.40k £11.05k £9.00k £9.00k £36.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 December 2024 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 December 2024 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 December 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 CHENISTON GARDENS
LONDON
W8 6TG
Phone:
02079376916
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available