FRANCISCAN FRIARS OF THE ATONEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian unity and inter-faith dialogue, pastoral care, social works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Canada
- Italy
- Japan
- United States
Governance
- 11 February 1964: Standard registration
- ATONEMENT FRIARS (Working name)
- GRAYMOOR FRIARS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derram Justin Attfield | Chair | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Janusz Edmund Janoszka S.A. | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert John Tomaskovic S.A. | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paolo Salvatore Nicosia S.A. | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
REV BROTHER DENIS BURGELIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.62k | £35.32k | £55.31k | £38.03k | £42.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.61k | £36.59k | £56.69k | £40.81k | £44.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1960
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT BY SUCH LAWFUL CHARITABLE MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DIRECTED BY THE SUPERIOR AND IN DEFAULT OF SUCH DIRECTION MAY BE DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES OF ANY CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND OR ELSEWHERE IN GREAT BRITAIN BY THE CONGREGATION OR IF AT ANY TIME THE CONGREGATION SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON CHARITABLE WORK IN ANY PART OF GREAT BRITAIN THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 PRATT WALK
LONDON
SE11 6AR
- Phone:
- 02077352655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window