Accounts and annual returns GREAT GLEN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 231977
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required