Accounts and annual returns THE GERALD DURRELL WILDLIFE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 232004
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2005 26 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 26 October 2006 263 days late