THE WILLIAM LEECH FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Principal activity is to act as trustee for three charitable trusts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Charles Brown | Chair |
|
||||||
Michael William Joynson | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dagmar Dvorak | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP BIRKETT MARSHALL | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Maureen Dixon | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Alice Hermione Laura Ambrose-Thurman ACA, ACIS | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Trevor Seddon | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Burrage BSc FCA | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN THOBURN STANSFELD | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|||||
John Overend Harrison BSc, ACA | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN POOLE | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/07/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/02/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2012
Charitable objects
"THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT”.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bank Chambers
26 Mosley Street
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE1 1DF
- Phone:
- 01912327940
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window