DOLE CHARITY (OR LITTLE GIDDING ANNUITY)
Charity number: 232065
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poor and elderly in village
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Total income: £2
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 January 1969: Standard registration
- 10 September 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 10 September 2009: Funds transferred to 232285 THE GREAT GIDDING CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £116 | £3 | £5 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £234 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 19 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 06 May 2009 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 15 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 06 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDED BY JOHN AND NICHOLAS FARRER BY DEED IN 1635 (P.R. 24 PAGE 45-46) AS AMENDED BY CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 9 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GREAT GIDDING
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window