LEEDS DIOCESE CHARITABLE SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to apply the clear income in relieving the need among clergy, deaconesses and licensed lay workers who are resident in or have served in the Diocese of Leeds and among persons who are dependent relatives of any members of the clergy by making grants of money.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- THE WAKEFIELD WEST RIDING CHARITABLE SOCIETY TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Leeds Diocesan Board of Finance | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.34k | £22.15k | £21.35k | £25.50k | £30.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50k | £6.00k | £9.70k | £455 | £21.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 04 APR 2018
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME IN RELIEVING THE NEED AMONG CLERGY, DEACONESSES AND LICENSED LAY WORKERS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN OR HAVE SERVED IN THE DIOCESE OF LEEDS AND AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE DEPENDENT RELATIVES OF ANY MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diocese Of Leeds
17-19 York Place
LEEDS
LS1 2EX
- Phone:
- 01132000540
- Email:
- finance@leeds.anglican.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window