Accounts and annual returns THE JOSEPH AND SARAH PEARLMAN JEWISH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 232082
Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required