GLAMORGAN FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer women the best opportunity to make an impact to influence local, national and world issues affecting the social economic and environmental life of families and communities and to learn new and traditional skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 17 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Bowring | Chair | 31 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Mavis Tierney | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Hansford | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Howard-Willis | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Maguire | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Daphne Furneaux | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Myra Thomas | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Davidson | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ATHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.26k | £93.89k | £57.15k | £107.73k | £133.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.72k | £80.04k | £46.85k | £102.94k | £137.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN GLAMORGAN AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 COURTLAND PLACE
PORT TALBOT
SA13 1JJ
- Phone:
- 01639881588
- Email:
- glamorgan@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
thewi.org.uk/glamorgan
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window