ASHTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 232113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charity to relieve the hardships of local Whiston residents

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,914
Total expenditure: £2,509

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Knowsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Mitton Trustee 19 August 2023
None on record
ROSEMARY LANE Trustee 19 August 2023
None on record
SANDRA PATRICIA MAYERS Trustee 01 April 2004
None on record
L M DONOVAN Trustee
None on record
Denise Allen Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.66k £1.67k £1.70k £1.79k £1.91k
Total expenditure £700 £3.50k £0 £0 £2.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WHISTON TOWN COUNCIL
WHISTON TOWN HALL
OLD COLLIERY ROAD
WHISTON
PRESCOT, MERSEYSIDE
L35 3SX
Phone:
01514307200
Website:

No information available