THE CABE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benevolent Fund to help Members and former Members of the Association Of Building Engineers or the Chartered Association of Building Engineers in distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 June 1964: Standard registration
- 11 October 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1194181 THE CABE BENEVOLENT FUND
- I A A S BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- THE ABE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.40k | £16.20k | £15.48k | £16.32k | £15.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.31k | £8.07k | £10.62k | £8.33k | £58.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02/01/1963 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES OF MEMBERS, RETIRED MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING ENGINEERS (FORMERLY CALLED THE INCORPORATED ASSOCIATION OF ARCHITECTS AND SURVEYORS) AND THE CHARTERED ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING ENGINEERS, AND OF WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND CHILDREN AND OTHER IMMEDIATE DEPENDANTS IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES OF DECEASED MEMBERS, RETIRED MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE SAID BODIES CORPORATE. FORMER MEMBERS SHALL HAVE AT LEAST 15 YEARS CONTINUOUS MEMBERSHIP.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window