FRANCIS C SCOTT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 232131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant giving

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Curl Chair 11 November 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Steinhart Trustee 11 November 2022
None on record
Ian Johnson Trustee 11 November 2022
None on record
Annalee Holliday Trustee 11 November 2022
MARYPORT COMMUNITY POOL
Received: On time
Sarah Dunning OBE Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Professor Karen Jane Stuart Trustee 09 July 2021
None on record
Christine Knipe Trustee 10 July 2015
ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE COMMONWEALTH
Received: On time
ASSOCIATION OF SHOW AND AGRICULTURAL ORGANISATIONS
Received: On time
CUMBRIA PROFICIENCY TESTS COMMITTEE FOR AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE
Received: On time
Alexander Scott Trustee 21 November 1985
CUMBRIA COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SCOTT BOLTON TRUST
Received: 23 days late
MADELEINE MARY SCOTT Trustee
THE BREWERY ARTS CENTRE ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR JAMES AND LADY SCOTT TRUST
Received: On time
LAKELAND ARTS SUPPORT TRUST
Received: On time
SCOTT BOLTON TRUST
Received: 23 days late
JOANNA MARGARET PLUMPTRE Trustee
THE BREWERY ARTS CENTRE ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
MELANIE MELROSE WOTHERSPOON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £668.67k £577.45k £454.75k £453.75k £558.16k
Total expenditure £1.54m £1.40m £1.56m £1.63m £1.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £46.60k N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £668.67k £530.85k N/A N/A £558.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.21m N/A N/A £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £127.65k £185.08k N/A N/A £237.39k
Expenditure - Governance £34.39k £28.51k N/A N/A £62.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.29m £1.10m N/A N/A £1.09m
Expenditure - Investment management £127.65k £185.08k N/A N/A £237.39k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £125.00k £125.00k N/A N/A £37.68m
Long-term investments £35.15m £38.42m N/A N/A £526.10k
Other assets £383.94k £421.38k N/A N/A £316.84k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £1.36m £1.40m N/A N/A £1.22m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HELEN CARTER
STRICKLANDGATE HOUSE
92 STRICKLANDGATE
KENDAL
CUMBRIA
LA9 4PU
Phone:
01539742608