GUY HOWLAND JACKSON MEMORIAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Grants or items to relieve poverty or ill health to those individuals residing in the parishes listed below. Grants will also be provided to charities or organisations working to alleviate poverty or ill health in the parishes listed below The charity only serves the Parishes of Talsarnau, Llandecwyn, Llan Ffestiniog,Trawsfynydd and Bronaber and Maentwrog in the county of Gwynedd
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 22 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Roland Peter Barnes | Chair | 06 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Nesta Hughes | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
ELFED POWELL ROBERTS | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Catherine Sidebotham | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Swann | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|||||
ELLEN MARY HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £609 | £495 | £533 | £533 | £533 | |
|
Total expenditure | £611 | £500 | £410 | £400 | £753 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25 FEB 1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 APR 1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 NOV 2023 as amended on 24 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ILL HEALTH OR POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR ITEMS TO RESIDENTS LIVING IN THE PARISHES OF TALSARNAU, LLANDECWYN, LLAN FFESTINIOG, TRAWSFYNYDD AND BRONABER AND MAENTWROG AND ALSO PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY OR ILL HEALTH OF RESIDENTS IN THE AREAS DESIGNATED ABOVE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mrs Angela Swann
Guy Howland Memorial Secretary
Gellideg
Talsarnau
Gwynedd
LL47 6UH
- Phone:
- 01766770686
- Email:
- angelaswann@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window