ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS GOOLE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims are to promote kindness & prevent cruelty to animals & further animal welfare work in our area (much of the DN14 postcode). The Goole and District Branch of the RSPCA is a registered charity in itÔÇÖs own right. Whilst we support & work closely with the national charity, other branches & inspectors, we are responsible for generating our own funds to help and care for local animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 January 1969: Standard registration
- RSPCA GOOLE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA - GOOLE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - GOOLE BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PHILIP PRICE | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JUNE WARD | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMY MELLOR | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA JANE PETTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACY MARSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE CAROLINE PETTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.12k | £58.54k | £33.96k | £45.00k | £66.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.80k | £61.77k | £54.19k | £59.50k | £67.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
GOOLE AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIELD LANE
RAWCLIFFE
EAST YORKS
DN14 8RR
- Phone:
- 07908410938
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window