ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NUNEATON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A fund raising group for the Nuneaton and District area. We fund the boarding and veterinary costs of animals from our area awaiting a new home whilst at the RSPCA Coventry animal home. We also provide a subsidised neutering scheme for owners on benefits as well as assisting when requested in the costs of veterinary assessments and treatments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 December 1963: Standard registration
- 09 May 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 May 2011: Funds transferred to 223678 RSPCA COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH
- RSPCA NUNEATON AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.63k | £25.84k | £30.12k | £22.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.43k | £25.66k | £73.07k | £26.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 08 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 29 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 20 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 11 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 17 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY (ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)), WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NUNEATON AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window