ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity Number: 232243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides animal welfare services and advice

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £455,054
Total expenditure: £501,596

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA - BOLTON BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Foster Chair
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Tracy Ann Davies Trustee 16 May 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Katherine Margaret Kay Trustee 20 May 2017
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
THE BOLTON GUILD OF HELP
Received: On time
PAMELA CLAIRE HOLT Trustee 19 July 2011
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
ANN ELIZABETH CLUBLEY Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
CAROL WALKER Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
HORWICH HERITAGE
Received: On time
MARY NEEDLES Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
SUsan MORGAN Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - BOLTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £310.03k £301.93k £385.57k £317.89k £455.05k
Total expenditure £187.84k £229.33k £324.88k £375.60k £501.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 Vernon Street
BOLTON
BL1 2QB
Phone:
01204521160